HI SB482 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and appropriates funds for an independent study and analysis of Hawaii's economy, including recommendations for public policy changes that will begin to address the cost of living, affordability, and quality of life issues that Hawaii residents face.
Title
State Economy; Independent Study; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=482&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB482_.HTM |