HI SB481 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides grants-in-aid to the counties for the purpose of identifying and mapping important agricultural lands and for expenses incurred for identifying and mapping important agricultural lands before the effective date of this Act for which the State has not previously reimbursed the counties. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Important Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB328 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7
HB328 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7