HI SB463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to adopt, no later than 6/30/2024, ordinances applicable to subdivisions not approved by 7/1/2024, requiring as a condition of approval, the subdivider or developer to obtain a street address and install a mailbox for lots, parcels, structures, or units of a structure within certain subdivisions before the sale or lease thereof. Requires condominium maps recorded in the Bureau of Conveyances or registered in the Land Court after 6/30/2024, to include a mailbox plan for the condominium property regime, showing the location of all mailboxes for all units in the regime. Requires, prior to the sale of residential real property, the disclosure as to the existence of a United States Postal Service deliverable mailbox for the property. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Property Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tam. |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, CPN. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Subjects
Approval Conditions
Condominium Maps
Condominium Property Regimes
County Ordinance
Mailboxes
Street Addresses
Subdivisions
Condominium Maps
Condominium Property Regimes
County Ordinance
Mailboxes
Street Addresses
Subdivisions