HI SB456 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in real property transactions based on lawful source of income. Effective 7/1/15. (SD1)
Title
Discrimination in Real Property Transactions; Source of Income
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1274 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.