HI SB455 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on TIA/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on TIA/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, upon execution of an executive order by the governor, banyan drive in Hilo to be turned over by the department of transportation to the county of Hawaii on 1/1/14.
Title
Banyan Drive; County of Hawaii; Transfer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=455&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB455_.HTM |