HI SB454 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB454

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes qualifying patients to form medical cannabis collectives. Specifies requirements for the collectives and members of the collectives. Requires the Department of Health to certify and regulate the collectives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis Collectives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/PSM, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB454 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback