HI SB441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an excise tax of 25 cents for e-liquid cartridges and fifteen per cent of the wholesale price of open system eliquid sold, used, or possessed by a wholesaler or dealer on or after 7/1/2023. Defines and amends related terms. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=441&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB441_.HTM |