HI SB44 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of the Maui Regional Health Care System to a legally constituted entity under certain conditions. Requires the Auditor to conduct an annual audit of the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation. (SB44 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation; Maui Regional Health Care System Transfer; Annual Audit
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 5:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-09 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-09 10:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-09 3:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 713). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Takamine, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Baker, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Chang, Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tsuji, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 424). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Saiki voting no (2) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Mizuno, Morita, Sagum, Takai, Ward excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-2009. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1715) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-06-09 5:15pm in conference room 308. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-09 4:30 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1309) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-24-09 10:00am in conference room 329. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-24-09. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-09 9:00am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 90) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hooser, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Galuteria, Hee, Kidani, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-19-09 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/LBR deferred the measure until 02-18-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH-LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH/LBR, WAM. | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |