HI SB433 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Kamehameha butterfly as the state insect.
Title
Kamehameha Butterfly; State Insect
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=433&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB433_.HTM |