HI SB428 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes prescriptive authority for qualified psychologists who practice at a federally qualified health center. (SD1)
Title
Prescriptive Authority; Psychologist
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 159) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Hooser . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Nishihara, Sakamoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Nishihara, Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-13-09 2:40pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |