HI SB425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB425
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires original equipment manufacturers of digital electronic devices to make diagnostic and repair information available to device owners and independent repair providers.
Title
Relating To Fair Digital Electronic Equipment Repair.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=425&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB425_.HTM |