HI SB414 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of the prosecuting attorney of the city and county of Honolulu as a grant-in-aid for the career criminal prosecution unit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of The Prosecuting Attorney Of The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB180 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB180 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1