HI SB41 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defers reimbursement payments to the State by the Hawaii health systems corporation (HHSC) for employer contributions to the employees' retirement system funds for 5 years from 07/01/2009 to 06/30/2014. Requires HHSC to reimburse the director of finance the total amount deferred no later than an unspecified date.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH-LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Referred to LBR/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=41&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB41_.HTM |