HI SB4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends definition of advance gambling activity to clarify that purchase of sweepstakes entry that also provides nominal non-gambling value advances gambling even if sweepstakes entry can be obtained without payment of consideration. Eliminates free play, beginning 01/01/2013, as a defense under certain circumstances. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Gambling; Lottery; Sweepstakes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Re-referred to ERB/JUD, FIN referral sheet 41 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 51) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |