HI SB395 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies additional elements of Hawaii's existing sexuality health education law and its implementation. Requires the DOE to provide certain types of information to the public and to parents. Allows parents to opt out of the DOE's sexuality health education.
Title
Women's Legislative Caucus Package; Comprehensive Sex Education
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB459 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=395&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB395_.HTM |