HI SB387 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 191, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a health carrier with a network plan to maintain a network that includes sufficient numbers of appropriate types of providers to ensure that covered persons have access to covered services. Specifies contract, disclosure, continuity of care, and directory publication requirements. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 191, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
2017-07-12SenateAct 191, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87).
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 459).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
2017-03-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
2017-03-30HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
2017-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-24HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350), recommending referral to FIN.
2017-03-23HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto.
2017-03-23HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
2017-03-17HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2017-03-14HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
2017-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
2017-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-27SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB914 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback