HI SB382 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB382

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes tips or gratuities paid directly to an individual by a customer of the employer and reported or declared to the employer under the definition of income withheld by employers for payments of child or spousal support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Payments Of Support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB382 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback