HI SB379 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the governor to negotiate land exchanges to acquire lands that are suitable for long-term diversified agricultural production in return for state lands to be developed for housing. Requires a report to the legislature. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land Exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH/AGR/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 112) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB379 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27