HI SB376 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 205, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 205, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals chapter 269, part VIII, Hawaii Revised Statutes, relating to the interisland transmission system. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Interisland Transmission System.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 205, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 205, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Green, K. Kahele). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 16). |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Takumi, Quinlan, Say, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Inouye, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Takumi Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Say, Tupola. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 390). |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Har, McKelvey, Oshiro, Say excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Yamane, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 138) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-23-17 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/TRE. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |