HI SB371 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB371
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "incidental and supplemental work" for purposes of specialty contractors under the contractors law. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:15PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LBT, CPN. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB558 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB371 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LBT, CPN.
SB371 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LBT, CPN.