HI SB369 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts adoption of selected regulations, by the University of Hawaii board of regents, from chapter 91 and requires adoption of selected regulations to be subject to chapter 92. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Rulemaking; Adoption of Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HEA, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |