HI SB367 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for violations associated with a person operating a vehicle after the person's license and privilege has been suspended or revoked for operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 30). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB367 (Carry Over) 2017-03-10 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Subjects
Fines
Highway Safety
License Suspension or Revocation
Operating a Vehicle Under the Influence of an Intoxicant
Highway Safety
License Suspension or Revocation
Operating a Vehicle Under the Influence of an Intoxicant
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=367&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB367_.HTM |