HI SB366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, on or before 1/1/2020, the public utilities commission to establish performance incentive and penalty mechanisms that directly tie electric utility revenues to the utility's achievement on performance metrics.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Ratepayer Protection Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=366&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB366_.HTM |