HI SB36 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of health to convene a mental health and substance abuse parity working group to determine how the State can come into compliance with federal mental health and substance abuse parity laws and regulations and enhance existing state parity laws. (SD1)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Parity; Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 24 | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Kouchi, Taniguchi). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-16-11. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |