HI SB352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or distribution of bottled water on state owned lands beginning 10/1/2019. Prohibits the sale or distribution of bottled water by permitted food trucks beginning 10/1/2020. Prohibits the sale or distribution of bottled water in the State beginning 12/31/2021. Prohibits the use of state funds to purchase bottled water. Provides for waivers and exclusions. Imposes civil penalties for violation. Establishes state policy on public water and bottled water.
Title
Relating To Bottled Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB352 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to GVO/WTL/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=352&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB352_.HTM |