HI SB351 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits advertising a public housing unit and housing subject to an owner or renter occupancy requirement under chapter 201H, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or chapter 206E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for rental purposes and requires county police departments to enforce the prohibition. Does not apply to any state agency advertising or publicizing a housing program under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB351 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Advertisement
County Police Enforcement
Owner or Renter Occupancy Requirement
Prohibition
Public Housing
Vacation Rental
County Police Enforcement
Owner or Renter Occupancy Requirement
Prohibition
Public Housing
Vacation Rental