HI SB3371 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates moneys for the Department of Human Resources Development to submit an annual report to the Legislature on the telework policies of the Executive Branch. Establishes requirements for a pilot telework monitoring system to assess the productivity of telework employees. Appropriates funds to develop, implement, and administer the pilot telework monitoring system and to establish positions. Declares that the appropriations exceed the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Teleworking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 335) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriations
DHRD
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Pilot
Positions
Report
Telework Monitoring System
Teleworking
Training
DHRD
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Pilot
Positions
Report
Telework Monitoring System
Teleworking
Training