HI SB3340 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii Maui College for the relocation of the University of Hawaii Maui College, Molokai Education Center. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Maui College, Molokai Education Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |