HI SB3335 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operational expenses of the Hawaii Wing of the Civil Air Patrol. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Civil Air Patrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 38-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 38-22). |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 9:35AM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Eli Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 571). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1847-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-29 | House | Re-referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 38 |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CMV with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CMV. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Costales, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 03-15-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to PDP, CMV, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3123) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2285) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2367 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to PDP, CMV, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Defense
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Hawaii Wing of the Civil Air Patrol
Department of Defense
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Hawaii Wing of the Civil Air Patrol