HI SB3326 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a penalty for landlord violations of the residential landlord-tenant code. Establishes minimum notice requirements for landlords terminating rental agreements. Limits the allowable amount for landlord rent increases annually. Requires landlords to pay tenants when terminating or refusing to renew a rental agreement.
Title
Relating To Tenant Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1895 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3326&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3326_.HTM |