HI SB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the marijuana dispensary special fund and requires DOTAX to transfer into the fund each year for enforcement purposes 15 per cent of general excise tax revenues from medical marijuana dispensaries.
Title
Relating To Marijuana Dispensary General Excise Tax Revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/CPH, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB319 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB319 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=319&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB319_.HTM |