HI SB3173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2023.
Title
Relating To Conformity To The Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2844) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2484 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 075, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Subjects
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2023
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax