HI SB3161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to issue temporary threatened species licenses and draft administrative rules for the conservation of threatened species.
Title
Relating To The Conservation Of Threatened Species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2472 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3161&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3161_.HTM |