HI SB316 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that reimbursement to crime victims includes lost wages and expenses for mental health treatment, counseling, and therapy. Effective 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Restitution For Victims Of Crime.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2017-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 6) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. , as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-17. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1347 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB316 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21
SB316 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21