HI SB3141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 106, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 106, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the schedules for controlled substances under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act for purposes of conforming with updates in federal law. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 106, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 106, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22 . |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 40-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 40-22). |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 11:05AM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Har, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 690). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1927-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 85) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Filed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2842) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2173 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3