HI SB3135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Examiner of Drivers to suspend the driver's license of a person using a parking permit issued to a deceased person who was deceased when the permit was issued to obtain parking privileges. Provides that fifty per cent of any fine imposed for violating part III of chapter 291, HRS, is remitted to the law enforcement agency that issued the citation. Authorizes each county to enact ordinances to enforce the design and construction requirements for the provision of accessible parking spaces, including the establishment of penalties for failure to comply with the ordinances. Authorizes officials appointed by a county to enter the property of places of public accommodation to enforce violations of the county ordinances. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 279) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2978) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2651) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2446 (Same As) 2024-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 685).