HI SB3133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the air freight inspection, quarantine, and eradication service fee and charge and corresponding fund to finance inspection, quarantine, and eradication activities relating to air freight that arrives at the State's airports. Transfers plant quarantine branch employees stationed at airports from the department of agriculture to the department of transportation.
Title
Relating To Air Freight.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/TRS, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Air Freight Inspection, Quarantine, and Eradication Fund
Air Freight Inspection, Quarantine, and Eradication Service Fee and Charge
Biosecurity ($)
Air Freight Inspection, Quarantine, and Eradication Service Fee and Charge
Biosecurity ($)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3133&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3133_.HTM |