HI SB3127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions for condominium association annual meetings and quorum requirements. Permits the board of an association to employ and discharge the managing agent of an association, subject to a vote of a majority of the unit owners at an association meeting. Provides an exemption for a condominium project in which a majority of the units have been submitted to one or more vacation plans, or in which one or more units has been submitted to a vacation plan established by the developer of the project or by an affiliate of the developers. (SD1)
Title
Condominium Associations; Managing Agent; Condominium Boards; Meetings; Quorum; Majority Vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1196-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-17-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-10 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 383) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2521) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2656 (Same As) 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).