HI SB3121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the Hawaii Public Housing Authority's powers relating to housing projects. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5). |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-13-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 270). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2878) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2432 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).