HI SB3108 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bans new underground storage tanks within one hundred yards of the shoreline, as of 7/1/2016. Prohibits operation of and renewal of a permit for an underground storage tank within one hundred yards of the shoreline, as of 1/1/2045. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Underground Storage Tanks; Shoreline; Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2532) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EET/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET/WLA, CPH. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |