HI SB310 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB310

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of health to post on its website, an easily understandable, searchable, and sortable list of all state-licensed care facilities with information on their licenses and inspections. Requires that the list be updated within five days of any change in its information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State-licensed Care Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee on HTH deferred the measure.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee on HMS deferred the measure.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HTH/HMS, CPN.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB310 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback