HI SB3099 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the availability of the state earned income tax credit until tax year 2028. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Earned Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 431) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2821) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2131 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).