HI SB3095 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Act 045, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning 1/1/2019, requires all users of restricted use pesticides to be subject to a requirement to report on their use of restricted use pesticides to the Department of Agriculture (DOA). Prohibits the use of a restricted use pesticide on or within 100 feet of a school during normal school hours beginning on 1/1/2019. Prohibits the use of pesticides containing chlorpyrifos as an active ingredient beginning 1/1/2019; provided that the DOA shall grant any person, upon request, a temporary permit allowing the use of pesticides containing chlorpyrifos through 12/31/2022. Provides for the deposit into the pesticide use revolving fund of all penalties and fines collected under the Hawaii Pesticides Law. Revises the ceiling and use of the pesticide use revolving fund. Requires the DOA to develop a pesticide drift monitoring study no later 7/1/2019. Appropriates general funds for the pesticide drift monitoring study, establishment of two full-time equivalent positions, and outreach and education. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Environmental Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateAct 045, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
2018-06-14HouseAct 045, on 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ito, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 154-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 154-18).
2018-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, C. Lee, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2018-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:00PM in conference room 224.
2018-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 10:03AM in conference room 224.
2018-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 833).
2018-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Kidani, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Nishihara.
2018-04-24SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 664).
2018-04-24HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Cullen discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
2018-04-24HouseRe-referred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 64
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke, C. Lee, Creagan Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ward.
2018-04-16HouseRe-referred to FIN, EEP, AGR, referral sheet 57
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 544).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno excused (6).
2018-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1827-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-03-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Todd.
2018-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:05PM in conference room 308.
2018-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2018-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-06HousePass First Reading
2018-03-02HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-02-18.
2018-03-01SenateReported from EDU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2579) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
2018-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 2:45PM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EDU/WAM.
2018-02-16SenateReported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to EDU/WAM.
2018-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2018-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2018-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/CPH deferred the measure until 02-14-18 2:05PM in conference room 224.
2018-02-12SenateRe-Referred to AEN/CPH, EDU/WAM.
2018-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:20PM in conference room 224.
2018-01-26SenateReferred to AEN/CPH, WAM/EDU.
2018-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback