HI SB309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes any advertisement by a candidate or candidate committee from the reporting requirements for electioneering communications; provided that the advertisement is in compliance with the law regarding advertisements.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB309 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB1399 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1399 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=309&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB309_.HTM |