HI SB3085 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the requirements for an individual to become a licensed dental hygienist. Clarifies the allowable and prohibited practices and training requirements for dental assistants. (SB3085 HD1)
Title
Dental Hygienists; Dental Assistants; Licensing; Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-30-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-16 2:20PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Tupola. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 340) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2514) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee on CPH will reconsider its previous decision made on 2/17/2016 and will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2706 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).