HI SB3082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of a "distressed property consultant" and "mortgage assistance relief service" in the mortgage rescue fraud prevention act. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Mortgage Rescue Fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 424) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2734) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2114 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Distressed Property Consultant
Foreclosures
Mortgage Assistance Relief Service
Mortgage Rescue Fraud Prevention Act
Foreclosures
Mortgage Assistance Relief Service
Mortgage Rescue Fraud Prevention Act