HI SB3082 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopts the Uniform Regulation of Virtual Currency Businesses Act and codifies the Act. Amends the Money Transmitters Act to expressly apply to persons engaged in the transmission of virtual currency. Requires a licensee dealing with virtual currency to provide a warning to a consumer prior to entering into an agreement with the consumer. (SB3082 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Virtual Currency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
2018-03-23HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno.
2018-03-20HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in conference room 329.
2018-03-20HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-18.
2018-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-03-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cachola, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
2018-03-16HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-03-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tokioka, Woodson.
2018-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 412) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2536) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara.
2018-01-30SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2018-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-26SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2018-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2257 (Same As) 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback