HI SB3080 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates supplemental funds for the Judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2019, and ending 6/30/2021. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Judiciary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-05-22HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 534).
2020-05-21SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, L. Thielen . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2020-05-19SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-21-20.
2020-05-19SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 357).
2020-05-18HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-05-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Thielen excused (2).
2020-05-15HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-05-15HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-05-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 05-15-20 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium.
2020-05-13HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 523) in amended form (SD 3).
2020-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2020-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-20.
2020-03-03SenateReport filed.
2020-03-03SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2020-03-03SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
2020-03-03SenateFloor Amendment No. 2 offered.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3304) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-13SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2683) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 10:01AM in conference room 016.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback