HI SB3060 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a class C felony for persons convicted of certain sexual offenses committed against a child twelve years of age or younger to reside within an unspecified number of feet of any school building or any real property comprising a school. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Sex Offenders; Penal Code
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:25PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |