HI SB3052 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all liability insurance policies to specify that when an examination of an injured party is requested by the insurance company, the selection of the examining doctor is made by mutual agreement. Authorizes the insurance commissioner or circuit court to select an independent medical examiner in the event a mutual agreement is not reached.
Title
Independent Medical Examinations; Tort Actions
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3052&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB3052_.HTM |